Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Trygve Lied Flagstad | 01.04.1993 | 29.03.2001 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1993 | 17.11.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henriette Lied Viskinge Jensen | 07.04.1999 | 29.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Christian René Tang-Jespersen | 11.04.1997 | 26.02.1999 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Trygve Lied Flagstad | 01.04.1993 | 29.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Suzanne Flagstad | 01.04.1993 | 29.03.2001 | formand |
Søren Christian Sundorph | 01.04.1993 | 07.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Mette Kristine Eriksen | 01.04.1993 | 11.04.1997 | bestyrelse |
Nicolai Dragsted | 01.04.1993 | 28.11.1996 | bestyrelse |