Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Werk | 01.12.2003 | 03.10.2013 | direktion |
Osvald Hansen | 01.03.2003 | 01.12.2003 | direktion |
Frank Viborg | 01.04.2001 | 01.03.2003 | direktion |
Osvald Hansen | 01.03.1993 | 31.03.2001 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1993 | 08.11.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Inger Dooleweerdt | 07.07.2005 | 03.10.2013 | formand |
Osvald Hansen | 16.06.2004 | 07.07.2005 | formand |
Flemming Werk | 01.04.2004 | 03.10.2013 | bestyrelse |
Tom Schmidt Hansen | 01.10.2002 | 01.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Ib Falkenfleth | 11.06.1997 | 30.09.2002 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Kærgaard | 01.03.1993 | 03.10.2013 | bestyrelse |
Eva Susanne Kalstrup | 01.03.1993 | 11.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.03.1993 | 08.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1993 | 08.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.03.1993 | 08.11.1993 | formand |