Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Gjessing | 01.03.1993 | 18.05.1998 | direktion |
Carsten Westh-Jensen | 01.03.1993 | 31.03.1996 | direktion |
Carsten Westh-Jensen | 01.03.1993 | 19.01.1995 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.03.1993 | 05.08.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Bartholdy Bech | 21.11.1997 | 18.05.1998 | formand |
Steen Hjøllund Hansen | 01.03.1993 | 18.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Martin Petersen | 01.03.1993 | 27.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ernst Pilgaard Dibbern | 01.03.1993 | 27.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Espersen | 01.03.1993 | 27.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jørn-Ole Steger-Jensen | 01.03.1993 | 27.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Birger Ingvard Rasmussen | 01.03.1993 | 27.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Alf Rudolf Kure | 01.03.1993 | 27.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Sommer | 01.03.1993 | 27.11.1997 | formand |
Niels Peder Larsen Nielsen | 01.03.1993 | 01.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ole Bjørn Almeborg | 01.03.1993 | 01.03.1996 | næstformand |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1993 | 05.08.1993 | bestyrelse |