Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jannick Birger Pedersen | 01.03.1993 | 24.02.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1993 | 25.11.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Larsen | 01.03.1993 | 24.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jannick Birger Pedersen | 01.03.1993 | 24.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Nils Friis Boesen | 01.03.1993 | 24.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Rasmussen | 01.03.1993 | 24.02.1995 | formand |
Christian Waarst | 01.03.1993 | 24.02.1995 | næstformand |
Helge Sørensen | 01.03.1993 | 14.12.1994 | formand |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.03.1993 | 25.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1993 | 25.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.03.1993 | 25.11.1993 | formand |