Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Nielsen | 27.06.2001 | 23.02.2021 | direktion |
Hans Egon Lentz Thomsen | 02.04.1993 | 27.06.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Egon Lentz Thomsen | 02.04.1993 | 31.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Palle Bo Niss | 02.04.1993 | 31.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Bente Mølholm Thomsen | 02.04.1993 | 31.12.2000 | bestyrelse |