Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kent Stenstrup | 01.03.1993 | 13.11.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jacob Mose Stenstrup | 01.12.2006 | 13.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Kevin Mose Stenstrup | 01.12.2006 | 13.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Martin Mose Stenstrup | 01.12.2006 | 13.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Kent Stenstrup | 01.03.1993 | 13.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Gert Walter Kring | 01.03.1993 | 01.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Lars Bo Baadsgaard Pedersen | 01.03.1993 | 01.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Per Fomsgaard | 01.03.1993 | 03.07.1995 | bestyrelse |