Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Mulbjerg | 30.06.2003 | 26.03.2007 | direktion |
Christian Skou | 01.02.1993 | 15.05.2003 | adm. dir |
Torben Skov | 01.02.1993 | 22.02.2001 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.02.1993 | 28.06.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Mulbjerg | 30.06.2003 | 26.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Mikkelsen | 30.06.2003 | 26.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Elisabeth Pasbjerg | 30.06.2003 | 04.07.2005 | bestyrelse |
Peter Vendelby | 01.07.2002 | 25.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Keld Harbo | 22.08.2000 | 30.05.2002 | formand |
Carsten Møller | 22.08.2000 | 21.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Rantzau Nehammer | 21.12.1998 | 20.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Kramer | 20.03.1995 | 22.08.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kim Weis Hansen | 20.03.1995 | 21.12.1998 | bestyrelse |
Torben Skov | 01.02.1993 | 15.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Christian Skou | 01.02.1993 | 15.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jon Dencker Norup | 01.02.1993 | 28.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Gottlieb Henriksen | 01.02.1993 | 20.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Erik Henriksen | 01.02.1993 | 20.03.1995 | bestyrelse |