Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frank Eistrup | 21.10.1992 | 07.12.1995 | adm. dir |
Henrik Skafte Schultz | 12.03.1992 | 21.10.1992 | direktør |
Hans Christian Jensen | 29.06.1984 | 12.03.1992 | direktion |
Inga Emma Jensen | 29.06.1984 | 15.03.1990 | direktion |
Vagn Jakob Jensen | 29.06.1984 | 14.10.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Elsebeth Dalgaard Skovdal | 29.06.1984 | 07.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Carl Henrik Skovdal | 29.06.1984 | 07.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Christen Jensen | 29.06.1984 | 07.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
John Kjær | 29.06.1984 | 07.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Inga Emma Jensen | 29.06.1984 | 17.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Visti Andersen | 29.06.1984 | 12.06.1990 | formand |
Erlang Riber | 29.06.1984 | 15.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Carl Henrik Skovdal | 29.06.1984 | 03.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Oluf Gert Pedersen | 29.06.1984 | 30.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Jakob Jensen | 29.06.1984 | 14.10.1988 | bestyrelse |