Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ivan Noes | 13.01.2003 | 26.09.2003 | adm. dir |
Peter Ibsen Christensen | 24.02.2000 | 13.01.2003 | adm. dir |
Kjeld Skov | 22.02.1995 | 24.02.2000 | direktion |
Niels Johnsen | 01.01.1993 | 22.02.1995 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.1993 | 27.05.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ib Damm-Ottesen | 28.01.1998 | 24.02.2000 | bestyrelse |
Niels Søllested | 01.01.1993 | 26.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
Ivan Noes | 01.01.1993 | 26.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jens Peder Bach Andreasen | 01.01.1993 | 26.09.2003 | formand |
Poul Erik Eslund Honum | 01.01.1993 | 13.01.2003 | formand |
Niels Johnsen | 01.01.1993 | 24.02.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Skov | 01.01.1993 | 24.02.2000 | bestyrelse |
Poul Christensen | 01.01.1993 | 28.01.1998 | bestyrelse |