Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Keld Askær Sørensen | 01.12.1997 | 01.12.1997 | adm. dir |
Hans Carl Kjær Thomsen | 01.06.1995 | 13.05.1997 | direktion |
Peter Vagn Jensen | 01.06.1995 | 13.05.1997 | direktion |
Gerhardt Amos Kristian Petersen | 01.12.1992 | 23.05.2002 | direktion |
Ole Juul Møller | 01.12.1992 | 31.05.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Garby Ramlau-Hansen | 25.09.2001 | 23.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Bernhard Torben Rosendal Christensen | 25.09.2001 | 23.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Anders Andreassen | 24.04.2001 | 23.05.2002 | formand |
Kristine Charlotte Marie Sigurdsen | 04.12.1997 | 23.05.2002 | personlig_suppleant |
Keld Askær Sørensen | 01.12.1997 | 25.09.2001 | formand |
Steen Smed Montgomery-Andersen | 01.12.1997 | 31.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Morten Nannastad Ernstsen | 01.12.1997 | 31.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Eigil Mogens Winther | 28.07.1997 | 01.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Gerhardt Amos Kristian Petersen | 28.07.1997 | 01.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Bernhard Torben Rosendal Christensen | 28.07.1997 | 01.12.1997 | formand |
Knud Mikael Valdimar Sørensen | 23.05.1997 | 28.07.1997 | formand |
Peter Axel Ole Adaralak Ostermann | 23.12.1996 | 28.07.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Ancher Høy | 23.12.1996 | 28.07.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jonathan Jakob Jørgen Otto Motzfeldt | 23.12.1996 | 23.05.1997 | formand |
Søren Hald Møller | 04.09.1995 | 28.07.1997 | bestyrelse |
Kristoffer Morten Mikael Ole Petersen | 31.05.1995 | 28.07.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ole Garby Ramlau-Hansen | 31.05.1995 | 28.07.1997 | næstformand |
Peter Ludvig Severin Jakob Fleischer | 01.12.1992 | 23.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Nikolai Jens Anthon Thue Svendsen | 01.12.1992 | 23.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Edvard Isak Karl Lars Mathiassen | 01.12.1992 | 23.05.2002 | personlig_suppleant |
Jens Albert Silas Jakobsen | 01.12.1992 | 04.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Cecilie Schmidt | 01.12.1992 | 04.12.1997 | personlig_suppleant |
Benjamin Elisæus Jørgen Hans Andersen | 01.12.1992 | 04.12.1997 | personlig_suppleant |
Henrik Nørkær Hansen | 01.12.1992 | 23.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Povl Brandt | 01.12.1992 | 23.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Bilgrav-Nielsen | 01.12.1992 | 23.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Schack Staffeldt | 01.12.1992 | 20.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Efraim Klaus Hans Lars Julius Olsen | 01.12.1992 | 31.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Anders Andreassen | 01.12.1992 | 31.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Peter Grønvold Samuelsen | 01.12.1992 | 24.03.1995 | formand |