Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Nanhed | 01.10.1992 | 31.03.2000 | direktion |
Leif Hammel | 01.10.1992 | 17.03.1995 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1992 | 21.04.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Nanhed | 01.10.1992 | 17.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1992 | 21.04.1993 | bestyrelse |