Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Bigom | 01.10.1992 | 10.02.1998 | direktion |
Esben Bigaard | 01.10.1992 | 23.08.1995 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1992 | 14.04.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Esben Bigaard | 01.10.1992 | 23.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Peter Anthony Boyce | 01.10.1992 | 23.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ian John Hunter | 01.10.1992 | 23.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1992 | 14.04.1993 | bestyrelse |