Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Nielsen Lund | 15.06.2011 | 27.12.2013 | direktion |
Hans Jørgen Nielsen | 18.02.2010 | 15.06.2011 | direktion |
Morten Vad | 28.11.1996 | 18.02.2010 | direktion |
Jens Olav Knudsen | 01.08.1992 | 28.11.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Nielsen Lund | 15.06.2011 | 27.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Elsebeth Svanberg Lund | 15.06.2011 | 27.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Sanne Svanberg Lund | 15.06.2011 | 27.12.2013 | formand |
Morten Vad | 28.11.1996 | 18.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Nielsen | 01.08.1992 | 15.06.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jens Olav Knudsen | 01.08.1992 | 28.11.1996 | bestyrelse |