Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Birte Enemark | 16.06.1997 | 16.07.2002 | direktion |
Karsten Fog | 29.06.1984 | 13.04.2004 | adm. dir |
Hans Georg Heinrich Enemark | 29.06.1984 | 16.06.1997 | direktion |
Tove Ingeborg Fog | 29.06.1984 | 19.09.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Holm | 16.07.2002 | 13.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Ewald Madsen | 08.05.2001 | 16.07.2002 | bestyrelse |
Birte Enemark | 16.06.1997 | 16.07.2002 | bestyrelse |
Niels Ebbe Valdal | 29.06.1984 | 13.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Fog | 29.06.1984 | 13.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Krøigaard | 29.06.1984 | 08.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Hans Georg Heinrich Enemark | 29.06.1984 | 16.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Tove Ingeborg Fog | 29.06.1984 | 19.09.1989 | bestyrelse |