Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Sudergaard | 19.08.2001 | 19.08.2001 | direktion |
Palle Ole Toubro | 19.08.2001 | 19.08.2001 | direktion |
Nina Beck Toubro | 10.08.1997 | 16.12.2013 | direktion |
Jens Bjerg Sørensen | 01.06.1992 | 23.10.2000 | direktion |
Søren Toubro | 01.06.1992 | 10.08.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Nina Beck Toubro | 19.08.2001 | 16.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Steen Sudergaard | 19.08.2001 | 16.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Palle Ole Toubro | 19.08.2001 | 16.12.2013 | bestyrelse |