Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Christian Vejlgaard | 18.10.1979 | 12.12.1995 | direktion |
Jens Henning Holt | 18.10.1979 | 23.12.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Christian Vejlgaard | 18.10.1979 | 12.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Bente Kirsten Holt | 18.10.1979 | 12.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jens Henning Holt | 18.10.1979 | 12.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Peter Sindberg | 18.10.1979 | 05.03.1992 | bestyrelse |