Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ove Gregers Larnæs | 31.05.2001 | 18.06.2003 | adm. dir |
Per Lagoni | 20.02.2001 | 13.06.2002 | direktion |
Shaun Michael Wright | 26.04.2000 | 28.11.2001 | direktion |
Dennis Kim Willer | 01.12.1997 | 30.09.2004 | direktion |
Bo Karas | 01.12.1997 | 01.09.1999 | direktion |
Lars Gottlieb | 01.01.1997 | 01.09.1999 | adm. dir |
Ove Gregers Larnæs | 01.01.1997 | 01.01.1997 | direktion |
Per Lagoni | 03.10.1995 | 01.12.1997 | direktion |
Klaus Holse | 10.07.1992 | 26.04.2000 | adm. dir |
Bo Karas | 10.07.1992 | 03.10.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Martin Hansen | 22.06.2004 | 30.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Dennis Kim Willer | 22.06.2004 | 30.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Nils Berg Johannessen | 22.06.2004 | 30.09.2004 | formand |
Asger Kastbjerg | 13.06.2002 | 22.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jan Jensen | 13.06.2002 | 22.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Alan Roy Dormer | 13.06.2002 | 22.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Per Lagoni | 18.06.2001 | 13.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Ove Gregers Larnæs | 31.05.2001 | 13.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Thorup | 31.05.2001 | 13.06.2002 | formand |
Søren Gath Hansen | 26.04.2000 | 13.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Shaun Michael Wright | 26.04.2000 | 31.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Preben Damgaard Nielsen | 27.04.1999 | 31.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Knud Carsten Bernhard Lønfeldt | 28.11.1997 | 13.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Lars Gottlieb | 08.07.1997 | 28.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Charles Nicholas Keating, jr | 03.10.1995 | 31.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Arne Gillin | 03.10.1995 | 27.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kim Arthur Hueg | 03.10.1995 | 08.07.1997 | formand |
Per Lagoni | 03.10.1995 | 14.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Lars Gottlieb | 27.06.1995 | 03.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Lennart Aure Ricard | 10.07.1992 | 03.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Aage Fredenslund | 10.07.1992 | 27.06.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Lagoni | 10.07.1992 | 26.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ove Gregers Larnæs | 10.07.1992 | 26.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Lars Gottlieb | 10.07.1992 | 26.02.1993 | bestyrelse |