Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jacob Perch Nielsen | 15.09.2000 | 13.02.2003 | direktion |
David George Tashjian | 22.03.1999 | 15.09.2000 | direktion |
Maurits Willem van Tol | 01.08.1992 | 22.03.1999 | direktion |
Preben Hejberg | 01.08.1992 | 23.10.1996 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1992 | 15.07.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Stephen Joel Rosen | 22.10.2001 | 26.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Perch Nielsen | 15.09.2000 | 23.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Alex Dolgonos | 15.09.2000 | 23.12.2004 | formand |
Torben Lund | 15.09.2000 | 10.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Stephen Joel Rosen | 15.09.2000 | 25.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Erik Munk Nielsen | 15.09.2000 | 15.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
David George Tashjian | 22.03.1999 | 18.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
Marinus Johannes Stroop | 05.05.1998 | 30.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
David Ray Mc Lemore | 23.01.1998 | 30.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Cornelis den Blanken | 23.01.1998 | 05.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Maurits Willem van Tol | 01.08.1992 | 22.03.1999 | bestyrelse |
Willy Koktved Goldby | 01.08.1992 | 23.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Ole Christian Herstad | 01.08.1992 | 23.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Preben Hejberg | 01.08.1992 | 20.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.08.1992 | 15.07.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1992 | 15.07.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.08.1992 | 15.07.1993 | formand |