Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marianne Sigfusson | 01.07.1992 | 31.12.1996 | direktion |
Steen Schierbeck | 01.07.1992 | 07.10.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marianne Sigfusson | 01.07.1992 | 31.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Claus Spangenberg | 01.07.1992 | 31.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Lars Eduard Klarskov Petersen | 01.07.1992 | 31.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Peter Sinding | 01.07.1992 | 17.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Kent Toftegaard Christiansen | 01.07.1992 | 05.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Steen Schierbeck | 01.07.1992 | 07.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Svend Carstensen | 01.07.1992 | 07.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jens Jørgen Skytte | 01.07.1992 | 07.10.1992 | bestyrelse |