Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Meyer | 04.06.1999 | 29.10.1999 | direktion |
Helge Gregers Villadsen | 04.07.1919 | 03.06.1999 | direktion |
Poul Tomsen | 04.07.1919 | 02.06.1993 | direktion |
Ole Valbak | 04.07.1919 | 09.07.1990 | direktion |
Hans Vagn Roager | 04.07.1919 | 08.10.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Rudbeck Petersen | 01.04.1996 | 29.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Niels Lykke Graugaard | 02.01.1996 | 29.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jens Fledelius Rickelt | 04.07.1919 | 29.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Per Kaiser Lauritzen | 04.07.1919 | 29.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Erik Carl-Theodor Sørensen | 04.07.1919 | 29.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Lars Kruse Andersen | 04.07.1919 | 29.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Ingrid Møller-Nielsen | 04.07.1919 | 29.10.1999 | personlig_suppleant |
Bjarne Rueholm Jørgensen | 04.07.1919 | 29.10.1999 | personlig_suppleant |
Thomas Wilhelm Andersson | 04.07.1919 | 29.10.1999 | formand |
John Villy Petersen | 04.07.1919 | 30.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Erik Henry Jensen | 04.07.1919 | 30.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Aage Ryssel Ramsgaard | 04.07.1919 | 03.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Lars Kruse Andersen | 04.07.1919 | 03.03.1997 | personlig_suppleant |
Verner Nørby | 04.07.1919 | 01.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ove Asboe Jørgensen | 04.07.1919 | 12.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Lykke Christensen | 04.07.1919 | 08.06.1995 | bestyrelse |
Alistair Gregor Davidson | 04.07.1919 | 08.06.1995 | formand |
Ole Valbak | 04.07.1919 | 02.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Poul Tomsen | 04.07.1919 | 02.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Lars Hallden | 04.07.1919 | 02.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jan Erik Norell | 04.07.1919 | 29.01.1992 | formand |
Ove Asboe Jørgensen | 04.07.1919 | 09.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Hans Vagn Roager | 04.07.1919 | 08.10.1987 | bestyrelse |
Rune Yngve Olsson | 04.07.1919 | 08.10.1987 | formand |