Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Christian Jensen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Drehn | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Arnam-Olsen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Carl Ib Merling-Petersen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Arne Hansen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Lis Margaret Westmann | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Børge Geert Olsen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Finn Pynt Andersen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
John Ejgild Andersen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Erik Frederik Daniel Weinreich | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Bent Erik Bøge Christiansen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Bendt Juul Nielsen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Olav Madsen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | suppleant |
Kristian Svend Peter Vadstrup | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | suppleant |
Oluf Gert Pedersen | 10.08.1907 | 06.07.1990 | formand |
John Sander Petersen | 10.08.1907 | 24.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Arnam-Olsen | 10.08.1907 | 24.08.1989 | suppleant |
Karen Inga Sidor Larsen | 10.08.1907 | 09.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Torben Husted Rasmussen | 10.08.1907 | 09.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Christiansen | 10.08.1907 | 09.12.1988 | personlig_suppleant |
Lis Margaret Westmann | 10.08.1907 | 09.12.1988 | personlig_suppleant |