Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tine Charlotte Lunn Schandorph | 10.06.1992 | 24.03.1997 | direktion |
Lindy Qvist Pedersen | 10.06.1992 | 04.01.1995 | direktion |
Jørgen Bouet | 10.06.1992 | 07.10.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tine Charlotte Lunn Schandorph | 10.06.1992 | 31.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Poul Olsen | 10.06.1992 | 31.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Christian Ditlev Schaldemose Lunn | 10.06.1992 | 31.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Lindy Qvist Pedersen | 10.06.1992 | 04.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Nils Erik Holst | 10.06.1992 | 08.07.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Bouet | 10.06.1992 | 07.10.1992 | bestyrelse |