Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brita Gudrun Thomsen | 16.01.2009 | 09.08.2016 | direktion |
Niels Peter Thomsen | 25.02.1992 | 17.12.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brita Gudrun Thomsen | 16.01.2009 | 16.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Dorthe Thomas | 25.02.1992 | 16.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Thomsen | 25.02.1992 | 16.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Peter Thomsen | 25.02.1992 | 16.01.2009 | bestyrelse |