Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Kaas Larsen | 01.02.1992 | 19.05.1999 | direktion |
Harry Thomsen | 01.02.1992 | 07.02.1995 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.02.1992 | 16.10.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Sundback | 16.09.1998 | 19.05.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Taidal | 16.09.1998 | 19.05.1999 | formand |
Finn Kaas Larsen | 01.02.1992 | 19.05.1999 | bestyrelse |
Peter Jessen Jürgensen | 01.02.1992 | 19.05.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Jürgensen | 01.02.1992 | 16.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Steen Klein | 01.02.1992 | 07.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Casper Moltke | 01.02.1992 | 07.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Harry Thomsen | 01.02.1992 | 07.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1992 | 16.10.1992 | bestyrelse |