Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Wienke | 01.02.1992 | 29.10.2007 | direktion |
René Thrane | 01.02.1992 | 02.09.1996 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.02.1992 | 10.08.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Færch | 25.11.2004 | 29.10.2007 | formand |
Morten Wienke | 02.09.1996 | 29.10.2007 | bestyrelse |
Svend Aage Dreist Hansen | 02.09.1996 | 25.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
René Thrane | 01.02.1992 | 29.10.2007 | bestyrelse |