Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Kurth | 01.09.2015 | 23.09.2015 | direktør |
Rasmus Peter Christensen | 29.02.2008 | 31.08.2015 | direktion |
Paul Børge Christensen | 20.03.2000 | 29.02.2008 | direktion |
Diego Ruben Gugliotta | 01.07.1998 | 29.02.2000 | adm. dir |
Torben Riis Hansen | 01.05.1992 | 01.07.1998 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1992 | 02.02.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Kurth | 31.08.2015 | 23.09.2015 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Andrew R Schiesl | 03.03.2015 | 23.09.2015 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Dr Stephan Becker | 03.03.2015 | 29.05.2015 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
David Antoniuk | 31.05.2013 | 03.03.2015 | bestyrelse |
Paolo Urbanis | 26.04.2012 | 23.09.2015 | formand |
Giorgio Angelino | 26.04.2012 | 30.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Walter Rudolf Kurth | 26.04.2012 | 03.03.2015 | bestyrelse |
Bradley Lauren Wideman | 26.04.2012 | 31.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Rasmus Peter Christensen | 29.02.2008 | 31.08.2015 | bestyrelse |
Paolo Dalla Giacoma | 15.06.2005 | 23.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Antonio Robuschi | 25.10.2001 | 26.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Paul Børge Christensen | 20.03.2000 | 29.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Diego Ruben Gugliotta | 04.01.1999 | 29.02.2000 | bestyrelse |
Ambrogino Ponzi | 01.05.1992 | 15.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Paolo Robuschi | 01.05.1992 | 25.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Torben Riis Hansen | 01.05.1992 | 04.01.1999 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.05.1992 | 02.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1992 | 02.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.05.1992 | 02.02.1993 | formand |