Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Dall | 01.01.1992 | 30.06.1997 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.01.1992 | 04.06.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Dinesen | 01.01.1992 | 30.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Bent Dall | 01.01.1992 | 30.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Peter Slaatorn | 01.01.1992 | 30.06.1997 | formand |
Kirsten Annitta Jensen | 01.01.1992 | 31.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Lorenzen | 01.01.1992 | 31.05.1995 | formand |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1992 | 04.06.1992 | bestyrelse |