Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Hald Nielsen | 01.02.1992 | 11.08.2004 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1992 | 20.08.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Fabricius Karmark | 28.04.1998 | 11.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Kjær Nielsen | 21.10.1997 | 11.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bent Christensen | 21.10.1997 | 04.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Brian Kenneth Høhl | 21.10.1997 | 08.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Kim Fabricius Karmark | 03.06.1997 | 21.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Hald Nielsen | 01.02.1992 | 11.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Anni Sørensen | 01.02.1992 | 11.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Petersen Rostgaard | 01.02.1992 | 03.06.1997 | bestyrelse |