Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kerrie Culff | 25.09.2013 | 08.10.2015 | adm. dir |
Ulrik Rasch | 09.02.2009 | 25.09.2013 | adm. dir |
Hans Bitsch | 23.04.2007 | 09.02.2009 | adm. dir |
Peter Magni Englesson | 15.09.2006 | 23.04.2007 | adm. dir |
Svend Erik Andersen | 01.02.2002 | 15.09.2006 | adm. dir |
Karl Skovbæch Pedersen | 23.05.2000 | 01.02.2002 | adm. dir |
Cato Praner | 01.11.1999 | 23.05.2000 | adm. dir |
Søren Greve Larsen | 01.10.1991 | 01.11.1999 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frederik Stege | 25.09.2013 | 08.10.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jacek Beldowski | 25.09.2013 | 08.10.2015 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Højsholt Nielsen | 25.09.2013 | 08.10.2015 | formand |
Asger Flygare Bech-Thomsen | 16.03.2009 | 25.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Rehling | 08.12.2008 | 25.09.2013 | formand |
Susanne Skov Boas | 17.12.2007 | 25.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Peter Magni Englesson | 23.04.2007 | 16.03.2009 | bestyrelse |
Ole Larsen | 19.08.2005 | 08.12.2008 | formand |
Mikkel Berg Bjerre | 19.08.2005 | 17.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Douglas Plummer | 01.08.2004 | 19.08.2005 | formand |
Hans Bitsch | 08.10.2002 | 23.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Mai Vedel | 08.10.2002 | 01.08.2004 | formand |
Kim William Nielsen | 01.02.2002 | 01.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Søren Eusebius Jakobsen | 01.02.2002 | 08.10.2002 | formand |
Annette Schmidt | 23.05.2000 | 01.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Erik Danquard Jensen | 23.05.2000 | 01.02.2002 | formand |
Cato Praner | 14.01.2000 | 23.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Søren Fogtdal | 14.01.2000 | 23.05.2000 | formand |
Søren Greve Larsen | 06.05.1999 | 01.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Anders Cold | 19.12.1998 | 06.05.1999 | bestyrelse |
Peter Henrik Asschenfeldt | 19.12.1998 | 06.05.1999 | bestyrelse |
Karl Skovbæch Pedersen | 01.10.1991 | 01.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Lars Krokstedt | 01.10.1991 | 14.01.2000 | formand |
Søren Greve Larsen | 01.10.1991 | 19.12.1998 | bestyrelse |