Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Suresh Kumar Ahuja | 23.05.1997 | 14.08.2000 | direktion |
Vijay Kumar Ahuja | 01.11.1991 | 23.05.1997 | direktion |
Suresh Kumar Ahuja | 01.11.1991 | 12.01.1994 | direktion |
Neelam Ahuja | 01.11.1991 | 30.03.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1991 | 21.05.1992 | direktion |