Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Bernhard Lemming | 01.11.1991 | 08.10.2018 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1991 | 08.03.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Benedicte Meyer Jørgensen | 01.11.1991 | 21.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Claus Michael Jørgensen | 01.11.1991 | 21.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ellen Lemming | 01.11.1991 | 21.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1991 | 08.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1991 | 08.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1991 | 08.03.1993 | formand |