Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Graugaard Pedersen | 01.11.1991 | 16.05.1997 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1991 | 01.04.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Graugaard Pedersen | 01.11.1991 | 16.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Leif Riis-Sørensen | 01.11.1991 | 16.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ejvind Fauerholdt Ramsdal | 01.11.1991 | 16.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Thorkil Dahl | 01.11.1991 | 10.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Slot Andersson | 01.11.1991 | 10.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1991 | 01.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1991 | 01.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1991 | 01.04.1992 | formand |