Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Preben Hundevadt Paulsen | 01.10.1991 | 05.02.1993 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.10.1991 | 06.04.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Thomas Sonne | 01.10.1991 | 01.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Peter Følsgaard | 01.10.1991 | 01.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Peder Thøgersen | 01.10.1991 | 05.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Preben Hundevadt Paulsen | 01.10.1991 | 05.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.10.1991 | 06.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Asbjørn Christoffersen | 01.10.1991 | 06.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.10.1991 | 06.04.1992 | bestyrelse |