Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gary Christopher Gregg | 25.03.1996 | 15.12.1997 | direktion |
Benny Nielsen Ladefoged | 01.10.1991 | 12.04.1996 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 12.10.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Wibrand | 01.10.1991 | 15.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Erik Hansen | 01.10.1991 | 15.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Poul Erdland | 01.10.1991 | 15.12.1997 | formand |
Lars Pries Nielsen | 01.10.1991 | 17.09.1993 | bestyrelse |
Andy Hyldal Christensen | 01.10.1991 | 17.09.1993 | formand |
Lars Janos Klima | 01.10.1991 | 17.09.1993 | næstformand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1991 | 12.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 12.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 12.10.1992 | formand |