Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Svartzengren | 01.10.1991 | 19.04.1993 | direktion |
Bent Okholm | 01.10.1991 | 06.01.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 03.07.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Wilmar Christensen | 01.10.1991 | 19.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Mølgaard | 01.10.1991 | 19.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Steen Svartzengren | 01.10.1991 | 19.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bent Okholm | 01.10.1991 | 06.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Lisbeth Dorthe Stilling Okholm | 01.10.1991 | 06.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Søtofte | 01.10.1991 | 06.01.1993 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1991 | 03.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 03.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 03.07.1992 | formand |