Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sven Mogensen | 01.10.1991 | 24.02.1997 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 26.02.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vitta Theresa Lysgaard | 01.10.1991 | 24.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Knud Lysgaard | 01.10.1991 | 24.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Svend Erik Nielsen | 01.10.1991 | 24.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Helge Wind | 01.10.1991 | 23.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Birger Ove Andersen | 01.10.1991 | 23.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1991 | 26.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 26.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 26.02.1993 | formand |