Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gorm Sas Thrane | 01.10.1991 | 06.11.2013 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 16.10.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dorte Holst Thrane | 24.04.2009 | 06.11.2013 | bestyrelse |
Gorm Sas Thrane | 01.10.1991 | 06.11.2013 | bestyrelse |
Ole John Thrane Nielsen | 01.10.1991 | 06.11.2013 | bestyrelse |
Knud Kasper Damsgaard | 01.10.1991 | 06.11.2013 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1991 | 16.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 16.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 16.10.1992 | formand |