Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Munk-Petersen | 01.10.1991 | 02.06.1998 | direktion |
Niels Egelund | 01.10.1991 | 02.05.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 14.01.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Birgitte Arendrup | 18.09.1995 | 02.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lau Lauritzen | 01.10.1991 | 02.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kim Munk-Petersen | 01.10.1991 | 02.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans-Peter Jørgensen | 01.10.1991 | 18.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Svend Skov | 01.10.1991 | 02.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Niels Egelund | 01.10.1991 | 02.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Svend Eli Jensen | 01.10.1991 | 02.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Niels David Nielsen | 01.10.1991 | 02.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jan Binderup | 01.10.1991 | 02.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1991 | 14.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 14.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 14.01.1994 | formand |