Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Lau Matthies | 01.10.1991 | 27.06.1995 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 12.06.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Alexandre E Smoliakov | 01.10.1991 | 15.01.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Lau Matthies | 01.10.1991 | 27.06.1995 | bestyrelse |
Tatiana Maximovna Manzon | 01.10.1991 | 27.06.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1991 | 12.06.1992 | bestyrelse |