Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bente Jørnvig | 01.09.1991 | 16.04.2009 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1991 | 15.04.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Arne Martin Thomsen | 04.06.1993 | 28.02.2006 | bestyrelse |
Bente Jørnvig | 01.09.1991 | 02.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Skov Jørnvig | 01.09.1991 | 28.02.2006 | formand |
Torben Christian Rosenberg | 01.09.1991 | 04.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.09.1991 | 15.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1991 | 15.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.09.1991 | 15.04.1992 | formand |