Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
James Thomas Ross Jackson | 01.10.1999 | 27.11.2004 | direktion |
Tor Norup Svensson | 15.04.1991 | 01.10.1999 | direktion |
James Thomas Ross Jackson | 15.04.1991 | 23.02.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Melchior Kongsted Kjeldsen | 15.04.1991 | 20.12.1999 | bestyrelse |
James Thomas Ross Jackson | 15.04.1991 | 20.12.1999 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Jakob Jensen | 15.04.1991 | 20.12.1999 | bestyrelse |
John Brew | 15.04.1991 | 23.02.1994 | formand |