Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Kragh | 01.05.2011 | 13.01.2017 | direktion |
Bo Rasmussen | 27.06.1991 | 01.12.2016 | direktion |
Hans Erik Kragh | 27.06.1991 | 01.05.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dea Cordt Kragh | 01.05.2011 | 01.12.2016 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Kragh | 31.05.2000 | 01.12.2016 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Lisbeth Rasmussen | 27.06.1991 | 01.12.2016 | bestyrelse |
Hans Erik Kragh | 27.06.1991 | 01.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Eva Vilhelmine Kragh | 27.06.1991 | 31.05.2000 | bestyrelse |