Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Dufour | 27.04.2000 | 08.12.2000 | direktion |
Henrik Dufour | 01.07.1991 | 31.12.1994 | direktion |
Robert Otto Kristiansen | 01.07.1991 | 02.08.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 06.02.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tove Dufour | 27.04.2000 | 16.08.2000 | bestyrelse |
Annette Dufour | 27.04.2000 | 16.08.2000 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Dufour | 27.04.2000 | 16.08.2000 | bestyrelse |
Tove Dufour | 01.07.1991 | 31.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Annette Dufour | 01.07.1991 | 31.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Dufour | 01.07.1991 | 31.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.07.1991 | 06.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 06.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 06.02.1992 | formand |