Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frede Clausen | 22.10.1997 | 17.05.2001 | direktion |
Jørn Jensen Holm | 21.04.1995 | 22.10.1997 | direktion |
Geir Magnus Jansen | 01.07.1991 | 02.12.1992 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 16.01.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Søndergaard Pedersen | 22.10.1997 | 17.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Frede Clausen | 22.10.1997 | 17.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Per Jensen Thorsager | 22.10.1997 | 17.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Jensen Holm | 21.04.1995 | 22.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Gert Lund | 01.07.1991 | 22.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ib Yde | 01.07.1991 | 22.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Geir Magnus Jansen | 01.07.1991 | 21.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 16.01.1992 | bestyrelse |