Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Walther Aage Dohn | 15.03.1995 | 20.02.1997 | direktion |
Ralf Jerltorp | 01.07.1991 | 15.03.1995 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 27.11.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Palle Oluf Daell Bjerrum | 01.02.1995 | 20.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Ole Lundgren | 01.07.1991 | 20.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Walther Aage Dohn | 01.07.1991 | 20.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Lykkegaard | 01.07.1991 | 15.03.1995 | formand |
Ib Kunøe | 01.07.1991 | 01.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 27.11.1991 | bestyrelse |