Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Skou | 10.06.1991 | 10.01.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Gunnar Jensen | 16.12.2004 | 10.01.2006 | formand |
Judith Irene Skou | 10.05.2004 | 16.12.2004 | formand |
David Braae Holm | 10.06.1991 | 10.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Skou | 10.06.1991 | 10.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Jarlbæk | 10.06.1991 | 10.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Torgny Pahle | 10.06.1991 | 10.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Holm | 10.06.1991 | 01.12.1999 | bestyrelse |
John Andersen | 10.06.1991 | 01.12.1999 | bestyrelse |