Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten From-Nielsen | 01.06.1991 | 28.06.2001 | direktion |
Jan Moosmand | 01.06.1991 | 28.06.2001 | direktion |
Bjarne Ravn | 01.06.1991 | 17.06.1994 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.06.1991 | 18.11.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.06.1991 | 18.11.1991 | bestyrelse |