Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Leif Joost | 15.09.2003 | 15.07.2011 | direktion |
Inge Joost | 02.01.1997 | 15.09.2003 | direktion |
Jørgen Leif Joost | 01.06.1991 | 02.01.1997 | direktion |
Niels Linden | 01.06.1991 | 28.11.1994 | direktion |
Henning Hansen | 01.06.1991 | 10.10.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Paul Erik Nielsen | 01.06.1991 | 28.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Lars-Erik Klem | 01.06.1991 | 28.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Andersson | 01.06.1991 | 28.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Mulle Johansen | 01.06.1991 | 07.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Schytz Hestelund | 01.06.1991 | 07.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Niels Grønnemose Madsen | 01.06.1991 | 07.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erik Kristen Jørgensen | 01.06.1991 | 13.07.1993 | bestyrelse |
Henning Hansen | 01.06.1991 | 10.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gaarden | 01.06.1991 | 10.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Tyge Jesper Rothe | 01.06.1991 | 10.10.1991 | bestyrelse |