Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Robert Anker Onsberg | 01.05.1991 | 06.02.1997 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1991 | 18.10.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Robert Anker Onsberg | 01.05.1991 | 08.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Michael Ibsen | 01.05.1991 | 08.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1991 | 18.10.1991 | bestyrelse |