Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Lewis Green | 10.11.1998 | 02.03.1999 | direktion |
Thyge Christian Dahl Hansen | 22.03.1996 | 10.11.1998 | direktion |
Erik Kragh-Hansen | 02.02.1994 | 22.12.1995 | direktion |
Sven Peter Wittsten | 04.01.1993 | 22.03.1996 | direktion |
Jan Evald Pedersen | 04.01.1993 | 02.02.1994 | direktion |
Claus Thomas Jespersen | 01.04.1991 | 04.01.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1991 | 26.08.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulla Plesner | 22.03.1996 | 10.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Erik Bonnerup | 02.02.1994 | 10.11.1998 | formand |
Ernest Schuster | 02.02.1994 | 22.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Lars Hammer Bloch | 02.02.1994 | 22.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Sven Peter Wittsten | 04.01.1993 | 22.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Birgitte Kirstine Faber Pilgaard | 04.01.1993 | 02.02.1994 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Jørgensen | 01.04.1991 | 10.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jan Evald Pedersen | 01.04.1991 | 22.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Blou | 01.04.1991 | 22.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Poul Søby Nielsen | 01.04.1991 | 02.02.1994 | bestyrelse |
Troels Christian Gunnergaard | 01.04.1991 | 02.02.1994 | formand |
Alexander Michael Schaumann | 01.04.1991 | 04.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Claus Thomas Jespersen | 01.04.1991 | 04.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.04.1991 | 26.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1991 | 26.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.04.1991 | 26.08.1991 | formand |